U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00261
  • Case Name: Wilcox v. Bibin et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • November 01, 2017: [Costs Taxed]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
  • October 11, 2017: [Supplement]
  • October 11, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • October 11, 2017: [Attorney Fees]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • September 28, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 25, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • September 25, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 06, 2017: [Dismiss]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 22, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • August 18, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • August 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
July, 2017
  • July 12, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • July 12, 2017: [Order]
  • July 12, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 12, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 13, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 10, 2017: [Reconsideration]
November, 2016
  • November 10, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Relief]
  • November 02, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order]
  • November 01, 2016: [Relief]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 17, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 12, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • October 05, 2016: [Sealed Document]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Seal Document]
  • September 30, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 30, 2016: [Statement]
  • September 30, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 30, 2016: [Strike]
  • September 20, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 06, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 16, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2016
  • July 06, 2016: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • June 17, 2016: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • June 06, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2016
  • May 02, 2016: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • April 25, 2016: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
  • March 09, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 09, 2016: [Counterclaim]
  • March 08, 2016: [Return Mail]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 24, 2016: [Order]
  • February 24, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 03, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Order]
  • October 23, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 23, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 14, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • September 25, 2015: [Declaration]
August, 2015
  • August 21, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2015
  • July 30, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 28, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • July 28, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • July 28, 2015: [Seal]
  • July 14, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 14, 2015: [Order]
  • July 14, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 13, 2015: [Complaint]
  • July 13, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.