U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00269
  • Case Name: Coates v. Black Dog Machine, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 13, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Order]
  • June 27, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 22, 2016: [Stipulation]
February, 2016
  • February 05, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
December, 2015
  • December 07, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 07, 2015: [Order]
  • December 07, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 04, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • December 02, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Order]
  • October 30, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 29, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 29, 2015: [Continue]
July, 2015
  • July 20, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • July 16, 2015: [Order]
  • July 16, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 16, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • July 16, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 16, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 15, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.