U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00274
  • Case Name: Estate of Jesus Madera et al v. Bayer Cropscience, L.P. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 23, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Status Report]
November, 2015
  • November 06, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 06, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Order]
  • September 28, 2015: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • September 24, 2015: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 21, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • September 10, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 04, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 01, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 01, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 01, 2015: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • September 01, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • September 01, 2015: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 01, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
August, 2015
  • August 21, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2015
  • July 21, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • July 20, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.