U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00279
  • Case Name: Corbett v. Remington Arms Company, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 06, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 05, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 06, 2016: [Dismiss]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • May 23, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 23, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order]
  • May 02, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 02, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
January, 2016
  • January 13, 2016: [Order]
  • January 13, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 06, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
December, 2015
  • December 07, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 02, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 02, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
November, 2015
  • November 02, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2015
  • October 16, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 02, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
September, 2015
  • September 23, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • September 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
August, 2015
  • August 17, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
July, 2015
  • July 23, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • July 22, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.