U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00278
  • Case Name: Grover v. Action Collection Service Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 04, 2016: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
November, 2015
  • November 05, 2015: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order]
August, 2015
  • August 06, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2015
  • July 27, 2015: [Order]
  • July 27, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 24, 2015: [Complaint]
  • July 24, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • July 23, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 22, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 22, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.