U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00282
  • Case Name: Magnuson v. Magnuson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 23, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 05, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • November 01, 2016: [Stay]
October, 2016
  • October 10, 2016: [Exclude]
  • October 10, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 16, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 15, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 15, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 09, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 09, 2016: [Withdrawal of a document]
  • September 09, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 17, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • August 15, 2016: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
  • August 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 15, 2016: [Declaration]
  • August 15, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 09, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 08, 2016: [Strike]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 14, 2016: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
  • July 14, 2016: [Declaration]
  • July 14, 2016: [Statement]
  • July 14, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • July 13, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2016
  • June 17, 2016: [Partial Summary Judgment]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 07, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 07, 2016: [Order]
  • March 04, 2016: [Stipulation]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • February 17, 2016: [Withdrawal of a document]
  • February 11, 2016: [Declaration]
  • February 11, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 11, 2016: [Quash]
  • February 11, 2016: [Expedite]
  • February 09, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 04, 2016: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • February 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 19, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 23, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
September, 2015
  • September 08, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • September 03, 2015: [Answer to Counterclaim]
August, 2015
  • August 20, 2015: [Affidavit of Service]
  • August 20, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 17, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 17, 2015: [Counterclaim]
  • August 17, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
July, 2015
  • July 24, 2015: [Order]
  • July 24, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 23, 2015: [Complaint]
  • July 23, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.