U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00241
  • Case Name: Roman v. Blades et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 07, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [USCA Order]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [USCA Memorandum]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • November 08, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [USCA Order]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [USCA Order]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Letter]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Request]
  • November 03, 2016: [Letter]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 14, 2016: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • July 14, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2016
  • March 14, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 09, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
January, 2016
  • January 12, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 12, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2015
  • December 15, 2015: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Order]
  • November 12, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 31, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 31, 2015: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 28, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 28, 2015: [Letter]
  • July 28, 2015: [Receipt]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.