U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00029
  • Case Name: Fletcher v. Marquardt et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 18, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 18, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • November 15, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 15, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • November 14, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 14, 2019: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • November 13, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • November 13, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 07, 2019: [Witness List]
  • November 07, 2019: [Supplement]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 30, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • October 30, 2019: [Trial Brief]
  • October 30, 2019: [Voir Dire Questions]
  • October 24, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 24, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • October 23, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 23, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • October 23, 2019: [Telephone Conference]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order]
  • October 22, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 21, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 17, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 16, 2019: [In Limine]
  • October 15, 2019: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • October 15, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 15, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • October 15, 2019: [Trial Brief]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • September 25, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 23, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Supplement]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Stay]
  • July 16, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Order]
  • May 20, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 13, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • May 09, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
  • May 08, 2019: [Response (generic)]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order]
  • April 24, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 19, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 18, 2019: [USCA Order]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 26, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 20, 2019: [USCA Memorandum]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [USCA Order]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Response (generic)]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • October 24, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • October 24, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 24, 2017: [Receipt]
  • October 23, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • October 04, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • July 25, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • April 13, 2017: [Response (generic)]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Order]
  • March 30, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 03, 2017: [Letter]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Supplement]
  • January 30, 2017: [Supplement]
  • January 27, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 18, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 05, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 14, 2016: [Request]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Supplement]
  • September 23, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
  • September 20, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 09, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • September 08, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 06, 2016: [Supplement]
  • September 06, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • September 06, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 17, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 03, 2016: [Letter]
  • August 03, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 03, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 03, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2016
  • July 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 22, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 22, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 19, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 19, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 19, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 15, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 15, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 15, 2016: [Request]
  • July 15, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 06, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 06, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Trial]
  • June 22, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 22, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 08, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 07, 2016: [Withdraw]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 16, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 10, 2016: [Response (generic)]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 13, 2016: [Response to Motion]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Strike]
  • March 23, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • March 21, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 07, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • February 09, 2016: [Order]
  • February 09, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 02, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • February 02, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Order]
  • January 19, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 19, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Supplement]
  • November 13, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 02, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • November 02, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2015
  • October 06, 2015: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • October 05, 2015: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 01, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
September, 2015
  • September 10, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • September 04, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
August, 2015
  • August 18, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 05, 2015: [Order]
  • August 05, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 05, 2015: [Certificate of Clerk]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.