U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00315
  • Case Name: Austin v. Wasden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [USCA Order]
March, 2017
  • March 02, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 08, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 19, 2017: [Judgment]
September, 2016
  • September 07, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • August 25, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 10, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Take Judicial Notice]
  • August 02, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2016
  • May 02, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 12, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • April 11, 2016: [Dismiss]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 07, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 03, 2016: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • March 03, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 03, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 11, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • February 11, 2016: [Supplement]
  • February 11, 2016: [Response to Motion]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • January 20, 2016: [Compel]
  • January 12, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • January 05, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 04, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 16, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 16, 2015: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • December 16, 2015: [Order]
  • December 16, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Supplement]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Receipt]
  • September 17, 2015: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 11, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 11, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • August 11, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • August 11, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.