U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00314
  • Case Name: Tuttle v. Treasure Valley Marine, Inc., et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 06, 2019: [Request]
April, 2019
  • April 04, 2019: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • April 03, 2019: [Status Report]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
March, 2017
  • March 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 06, 2017: [Response to Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 21, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 19, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 05, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 05, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Stay]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Notice of Bankruptcy Filing]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 31, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 29, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 10, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 09, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order]
  • August 08, 2016: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • August 08, 2016: [Stipulation]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 13, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • July 12, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 12, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment]
  • June 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
April, 2016
  • April 01, 2016: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • March 09, 2016: [Consent to Arbitration]
January, 2016
  • January 08, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
December, 2015
  • December 11, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 09, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 04, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • November 24, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • November 05, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 05, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 04, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 04, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • November 04, 2015: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 04, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 02, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • November 02, 2015: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 02, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • November 02, 2015: [Approve Consent Judgment]
  • November 02, 2015: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
August, 2015
  • August 19, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • August 12, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.