U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00117
  • Case Name: Carmen v. Breville Group Limited et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Declaration]
  • August 09, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • April 13, 2018: [Order]
  • April 13, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 10, 2018: [Joinder]
  • April 09, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 05, 2018: [Stay]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Order]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • December 19, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 07, 2017: [Litigation Order]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 01, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 30, 2017: [Supplement]
  • October 24, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 23, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 23, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 23, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • October 20, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 18, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 26, 2017: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • July 26, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 01, 2017: [Reconsideration]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Order]
  • March 30, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • March 30, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 30, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2016
  • October 06, 2016: [Supplement]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Declaration]
  • September 28, 2016: [Supplement]
  • September 28, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
  • September 28, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • July 18, 2016: [Stipulation]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • April 04, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 11, 2016: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 11, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 07, 2016: [Errata]
  • March 07, 2016: [Dismiss]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 26, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • December 15, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 03, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2015
  • November 09, 2015: [Letter]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Order]
  • October 26, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • October 26, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • October 20, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • October 19, 2015: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • October 12, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 06, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • October 05, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Order]
  • September 29, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 29, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • September 28, 2015: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 28, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 18, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • September 03, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 03, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 27, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 27, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • August 27, 2015: [Notice of Substitution]
  • August 20, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 20, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.