U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00277
  • Case Name: Morgan v. TSN Auto Sales LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 04, 2015: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2015
  • October 01, 2015: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 08, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • September 04, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 27, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • August 26, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • August 26, 2015: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.