U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00341
  • Case Name: Schoenhut v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Order]
  • June 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 01, 2017: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • March 31, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 31, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2016
  • March 11, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 21, 2016: [Declaration]
  • January 21, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Administrative Record]
  • November 24, 2015: [Answer to Petition for Review]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • September 25, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • August 27, 2015: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • August 26, 2015: [Petition for Review]
  • August 26, 2015: [Statement of Social Security Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.