U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00351
  • Case Name: Seamons v. Ramirez et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 30, 2018: [Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 06, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • February 05, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • February 01, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 01, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • February 01, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 31, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 31, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 29, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 29, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 26, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • January 24, 2018: [Order]
  • January 17, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Request]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 20, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 11, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • March 14, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • March 14, 2017: [Seal Document]
  • March 14, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [Letter]
  • December 01, 2016: [Request]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • November 16, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
  • November 14, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [Supplement]
  • October 17, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 08, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 01, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 01, 2016: [Compel]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Letter]
  • August 08, 2016: [Response to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Temporary Restraining Order]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 29, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
  • June 28, 2016: [Request]
  • June 17, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 07, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 06, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 05, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Receipt]
  • April 11, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2016
  • March 18, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2016: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • March 18, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 16, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • March 10, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • March 09, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 09, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • February 09, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 09, 2016: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • February 09, 2016: [Order]
  • February 09, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2015
  • September 02, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 02, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • September 02, 2015: [Complaint]
  • September 02, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • September 02, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.