U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00463
  • Case Name: Reid v. Mabus et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Return Mail]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [Return Mail]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Return Mail]
  • December 10, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 08, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order]
October, 2015
  • October 06, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • October 06, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • October 02, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 02, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.