U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00478
  • Case Name: Booth v. Pocatello Med Partners, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Order]
  • January 14, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 11, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 20, 2018: [Strike]
  • August 10, 2018: [Declaration]
  • August 10, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • July 27, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 19, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order]
  • July 17, 2018: [Stipulation]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Declaration]
  • June 28, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 01, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 01, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 01, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • May 29, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 24, 2018: [Appendix]
  • May 24, 2018: [Declaration]
  • May 24, 2018: [Continue]
  • May 21, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 21, 2018: [Order]
  • May 08, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Order]
  • March 26, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 26, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 23, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Order]
  • January 24, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 22, 2018: [Stipulation]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Order]
  • October 30, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 20, 2017: [Extension of Time to Amend]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Order]
  • August 02, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 02, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Extension of Time to Amend]
June, 2017
  • June 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • June 08, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Status Conference]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 09, 2017: [Order]
  • February 09, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 09, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 07, 2017: [Continue]
  • February 06, 2017: [Protective Order]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • January 05, 2017: [Summons Reissued]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 07, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 05, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • December 01, 2016: [Response to Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 13, 2016: [Leave to File Document]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 18, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 16, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 03, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 02, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • April 15, 2016: [Order]
  • April 13, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 13, 2016: [Stipulation]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 18, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • March 18, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 09, 2016: [Order]
  • February 09, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 09, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • February 05, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
  • February 02, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • February 02, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • January 13, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 13, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • January 11, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 07, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Order]
  • December 21, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 15, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2015
  • October 13, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.