U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00507
  • Case Name: McDowell v. Jefferson County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 30, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 15, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • May 01, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 14, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • February 10, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order]
  • February 07, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 19, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 19, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 23, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 22, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 11, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 09, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Strike]
  • October 31, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 25, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 12, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 12, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 12, 2016: [Response to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 14, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 03, 2016: [Stipulation]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Certificate of Compliance]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • April 08, 2016: [Dismiss]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • January 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • December 07, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 07, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 17, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • November 16, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • November 16, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 05, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • October 30, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 29, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 29, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • October 28, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.