U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:13-cv-00518
  • Case Name: Micklesen v. Watkins and Shepard Trucking Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Transcript]
  • April 28, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Exhibit List]
  • November 13, 2015: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • November 13, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 13, 2015: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • November 13, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 12, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 12, 2015: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 12, 2015: [Bench Trial - Begun]
  • November 12, 2015: [Jury Selection (sealed)]
  • November 09, 2015: [Response (generic)]
  • November 06, 2015: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 06, 2015: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 03, 2015: [Objection]
  • November 03, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 03, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 03, 2015: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.