U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00128
  • Case Name: Garland v. Yoakum et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 02, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • January 17, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Order]
  • November 28, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 18, 2016: [Stipulation]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 20, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • September 20, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • September 02, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order]
  • September 01, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2016
  • August 09, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 09, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 02, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
July, 2016
  • July 18, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 15, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 14, 2016: [Status Report]
  • July 14, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2016
  • June 03, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 03, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order]
  • June 01, 2016: [Status Report]
April, 2016
  • April 05, 2016: [Order]
  • April 05, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • March 30, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 29, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.