U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00310
  • Case Name: Blamires v. Rock Creek Rural Fire Protection District et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 23, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 07, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • December 07, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 01, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 29, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • September 29, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 15, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 09, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 01, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2016
  • August 09, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • August 08, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • August 08, 2016: [Stay]
  • August 08, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 03, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order]
  • July 19, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 12, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • July 11, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.