U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00449
  • Case Name: J.R. Simplot Company v. McCain Foods USA, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Judgment as a Matter of Law]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Seal]
  • March 15, 2022: [Seal]
  • March 15, 2022: [Strike]
  • March 14, 2022: [Seal]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 23, 2022: [Seal]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Exclude]
  • January 26, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 26, 2022: [Seal]
  • January 24, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 03, 2021: [Seal]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Seal]
  • November 09, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 04, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 04, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 04, 2021: [Seal]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 04, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Seal]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Seal]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Bifurcate]
  • June 23, 2021: [Compel]
  • June 23, 2021: [Seal]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Seal]
  • May 10, 2021: [Seal]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 30, 2021: [Seal]
  • April 30, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2021: [Seal]
  • April 19, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Quash]
  • March 25, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 19, 2021: [Seal]
  • March 05, 2021: [Seal]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 02, 2021: [File Excess Pages]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Seal]
  • January 21, 2021: [Continue]
  • January 15, 2021: [File Excess Pages]
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [File Amicus Brief]
  • December 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • November 30, 2020: [Seal]
  • November 04, 2020: [Seal]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Issuance]
  • September 30, 2020: [Seal]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 28, 2020: [Seal Document]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Seal]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • April 29, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • April 29, 2020: [Declaration]
  • April 29, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 29, 2020: [Seal]
  • April 28, 2020: [Order]
  • April 21, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 10, 2020: [Stipulation]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Settlement Conference]
  • March 03, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • March 03, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 21, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 21, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 06, 2020: [Order]
  • February 06, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • January 03, 2020: [Redaction Request - Transcript]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Transcript]
  • December 18, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 13, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 13, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 06, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • November 25, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • November 25, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 20, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 19, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 15, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 13, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • November 12, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 08, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • November 01, 2019: [Sever]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 07, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 07, 2019: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 16, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 16, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 13, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Issuance]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order]
  • August 01, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • July 30, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 30, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 09, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • July 08, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 08, 2019: [Third Party Complaint]
  • July 01, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order]
  • July 01, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 27, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 13, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 13, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 07, 2019: [Response to Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • May 23, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 17, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 25, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 25, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • March 18, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 15, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • March 04, 2019: [Compel]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 05, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 24, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
  • January 23, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
  • January 11, 2019: [Order]
  • January 11, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 11, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 18, 2018: [Continue]
  • October 18, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order]
  • October 05, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 24, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 20, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • September 20, 2018: [Declaration]
  • September 20, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • September 20, 2018: [Seal Document]
  • September 14, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • August 16, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • July 19, 2018: [Transcript]
  • July 19, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • July 17, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 12, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 12, 2018: [Markman Hearing]
  • July 06, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 04, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • May 04, 2018: [Declaration]
  • May 04, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • May 04, 2018: [Seal Document]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Order]
  • April 18, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 17, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 10, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • April 04, 2018: [Withdraw]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 27, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 12, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 12, 2018: [Protective Order]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order]
  • November 09, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 06, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 02, 2017: [Protective Order]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • September 18, 2017: [Consolidate Cases]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order]
  • August 11, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 01, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Supplement]
  • July 28, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • July 28, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • July 28, 2017: [Seal Document]
  • July 07, 2017: [Partial Summary Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order]
  • April 07, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 06, 2017: [Consent Filed]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 14, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 13, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 07, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order]
  • February 02, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 02, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • February 02, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 26, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
November, 2016
  • November 07, 2016: [Status Report]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • October 11, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • October 07, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 07, 2016: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • October 07, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.