U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00121
  • Case Name: Horne v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • June 17, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 16, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 16, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • January 12, 2018: [Remand]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Declaration]
  • December 26, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
  • December 01, 2017: [Declaration]
  • December 01, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2017
  • November 01, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2017
  • August 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 18, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • July 21, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
  • July 20, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • July 18, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 14, 2017: [Administrative Record]
  • July 14, 2017: [Answer to Petition for Review]
  • July 12, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 21, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • March 21, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • March 17, 2017: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.