U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00143
  • Case Name: Hampton v. City of Nampa
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 28, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 08, 2017: [Order to Show Cause]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
  • July 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • July 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 18, 2017: [Withdraw]
  • July 18, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 05, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • May 30, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • May 04, 2017: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • May 04, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 01, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • April 12, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 12, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • April 11, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 07, 2017: [Receipt]
  • April 07, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • April 04, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.