U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00181
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Moyle
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • September 07, 2017: [Default Judgment]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 21, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • July 11, 2017: [Entry of Default]
June, 2017
  • June 02, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • April 27, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.