U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00198
  • Case Name: Thieme v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 27, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • October 13, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 06, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 09, 2017: [Administrative Record]
  • August 09, 2017: [Answer to Petition for Review]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • July 14, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • July 14, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 12, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • May 09, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • May 08, 2017: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • May 08, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 08, 2017: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.