U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00271
  • Case Name: Meraz v. Hansen Rice, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 18, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 04, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • December 04, 2018: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 04, 2018: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • September 05, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 05, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Order]
  • July 18, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 17, 2018: [Stipulation]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 02, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 02, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 02, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • May 02, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 02, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 27, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • February 08, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 19, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 31, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 24, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 24, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 24, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 13, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • October 13, 2017: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 22, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 22, 2017: [Counterclaim]
  • September 20, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 18, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • September 18, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • September 05, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • September 01, 2017: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • September 01, 2017: [Dismiss]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • August 22, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 21, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • August 10, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 10, 2017: [Counterclaim]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • June 27, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.