U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00276
  • Case Name: Black v. Moody et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • October 17, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 06, 2017: [Dismiss]
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: [Return Mail]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • August 25, 2017: [Order]
  • August 25, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 10, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Supplement]
  • July 14, 2017: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • July 13, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • July 13, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 05, 2017: [Request]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.