U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00318
  • Case Name: Barber v. Cox et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • June 26, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2019
  • May 07, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 07, 2019: [Request]
  • May 07, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 05, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order]
  • February 05, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • October 11, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 10, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 10, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order]
  • April 17, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: [Order]
January, 2018
  • January 10, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 03, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • August 03, 2017: [Complaint]
  • August 03, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • August 03, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 03, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.