U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00399
  • Case Name: Busby v. Potter and Potter Auctions, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 21, 2018: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Order]
  • February 16, 2018: [Status Report]
January, 2018
  • January 02, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Order]
  • December 13, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 13, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • December 11, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • December 07, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 28, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 01, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 31, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 20, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 20, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 04, 2017: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.