U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00415
  • Case Name: Leibar v. Anchustegui et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: [Judgment]
  • October 17, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order]
  • August 10, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 10, 2018: [Stipulation]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • July 11, 2018: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • July 02, 2018: [Protective Order]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Settlement Conference]
  • February 20, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Order]
  • January 22, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • November 29, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 28, 2017: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • November 15, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 15, 2017: [Counterclaim]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order]
  • November 14, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • November 09, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 02, 2017: [Litigation Order]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
  • October 30, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 30, 2017: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • October 26, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 26, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 25, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 20, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 19, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 10, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • October 06, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.