U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00211
  • Case Name: Owens v. Jackson-Heim et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • August 15, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 07, 2018: [Affidavit of Service]
  • August 02, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • July 16, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 20, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • June 20, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • December 20, 2017: [Disclosure Statement]
  • December 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.