U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00033
  • Case Name: Clements v. The Standard Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 23, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 01, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 23, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 23, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 12, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 12, 2018: [Affidavit of Service]
  • February 05, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 05, 2018: [Litigation Order]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • January 29, 2018: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • January 25, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • January 24, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.