U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00043
  • Case Name: Velazquez v. Midland Funding, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 20, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 19, 2019: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Order]
  • October 16, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 04, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Status Report]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • June 05, 2019: [1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • June 04, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 16, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 22, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • March 06, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Take Judicial Notice]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 19, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 14, 2019: [Joinder]
  • February 08, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 08, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Declaration]
  • January 25, 2019: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • January 25, 2019: [Quash]
  • January 18, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 18, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order]
  • January 11, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • January 11, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 26, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order]
  • December 21, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 19, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • December 10, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • December 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 25, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 22, 2018: [Supplement]
  • October 20, 2018: [Strike]
  • October 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 19, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • October 19, 2018: [Declaration]
  • October 19, 2018: [Seal Document]
  • October 09, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 05, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 01, 2018: [Errata]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • September 25, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 14, 2018: [Order]
  • September 13, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • September 07, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 29, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 28, 2018: [Stay]
  • August 23, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 23, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 23, 2018: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • August 23, 2018: [Quash]
  • August 07, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
  • August 03, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 13, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • April 16, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 16, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order]
  • April 12, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • April 12, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
  • March 21, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • March 20, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2018: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • March 09, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • March 08, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 06, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • March 06, 2018: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 06, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 05, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 12, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 05, 2018: [Litigation Order]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • January 29, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.