U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00046
  • Case Name: Navarro v. National Credit Adjusters, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 03, 2018: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
  • February 09, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 06, 2018: [Litigation Order]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • January 30, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.