U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00087
  • Case Name: Coronado v. Chobani Idaho, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 21, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 19, 2019: [~Util - Set Trial Management Order Deadlines]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • October 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • October 21, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 20, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 06, 2019: [Response to Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Declaration]
  • July 30, 2019: [Strike]
  • July 30, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 26, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • July 17, 2019: [Seal]
  • July 16, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 16, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Order]
  • June 19, 2019: [Stipulation]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 09, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 07, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2019
  • April 11, 2019: [Order]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Expedite]
  • March 28, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 20, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • March 18, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 18, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • March 18, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • March 18, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 15, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 10, 2019: [Response to Motion]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 19, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 09, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • April 09, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • March 19, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • March 16, 2018: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 16, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 05, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • February 22, 2018: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.