U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00363
  • Case Name: Wiser v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 08, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
July, 2019
  • July 11, 2019: [Settlement Conference]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Order]
  • June 12, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • February 14, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 07, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • January 02, 2019: [Corrective Entry]
  • January 02, 2019: [Remand]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order Staying Case]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order]
  • November 30, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • November 30, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 25, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order]
  • October 22, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 18, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • October 18, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • October 18, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • October 17, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 15, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • October 15, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 06, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • August 20, 2018: [Summons Issued as to USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.