U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00112
  • Case Name: Munden et al v. Stewart Title Guaranty Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • April 14, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 10, 2020: [Receipt]
  • April 10, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 11, 2020: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 11, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 24, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 08, 2019: [Continue]
  • October 04, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 04, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 14, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 14, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 14, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • August 07, 2019: [Response to Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 26, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 26, 2019: [Order]
  • July 25, 2019: [Discovery Plan]
  • July 25, 2019: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • July 11, 2019: [Partial Summary Judgment]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Litigation Order]
  • June 19, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 12, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 12, 2019: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • June 12, 2019: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • June 10, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 05, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • June 04, 2019: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • June 03, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Consents (All are in)]
  • May 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 23, 2019: [Consent Filed]
  • May 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 22, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order]
  • May 15, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 14, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • May 13, 2019: [Entry of Default]
  • May 08, 2019: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 08, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • May 08, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • May 07, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 07, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 06, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 03, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Litigation Order]
  • April 09, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • April 09, 2019: [Corrective Entry]
  • April 04, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.