open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Idaho

IDAHO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Idaho
    Case Number:19-00923-
    Party Name:Sarah Ann Harris
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hillen, Noah G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hillen, Noah G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Approving Trustee's Report of No Distribution and Closing Case]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hillen, Noah G. [Approving Trustee's Report of No Distribution and Closing Case (No Asset)]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hillen, Noah G. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hillen, Noah G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hillen, Noah G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ch.7/13 Income Tax Turnover Order]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hillen, Noah G. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hillen, Noah G. [Income Tax Turnover Order]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hillen, Noah G. [Social Security Statement (SEALED)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hillen, Noah G. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.idb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?161456
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =