open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho

IDAHO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho
    Case Number:3:19-cr-00288-1
    Party Name:USA v. Tomasi
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea and Sentence]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:November 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss]
    Date Published:November 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention, Temporary]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Docket Entry Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Procedural Order - Docket Text]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment - Docket Text]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detain]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.idd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?44399
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =