U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-00127-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Curiel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 07, 2022: [Release from Custody]
  • February 04, 2022: [Release from Custody]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 13, 2021: [Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Suppress]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Continue]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Detain]
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.