U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00166-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hornof
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [In Limine]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 02, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Continue]
  • July 01, 2021: [Detain]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.