open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois

ILLINOIS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois
    Case Number:1:19-cv-07387
    Party Name:United States of America v. Hilliard
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA Order Appointing Counsel]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Defendant Name]
    Date Published:August 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
    Date Published:August 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Supplement]
    Date Published:December 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:December 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Supplement]
    Date Published:December 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment (Sentencing Order)]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminated Defendant]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Sentencing Held]
    Date Published:February 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Forfeiture]
    Date Published:January 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:August 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave the Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Limine]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ilnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?277758
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =