Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00422-1
    Party Name:USA v. Valadez
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Counsel]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance Held]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Set/Reset Hearings - USM In Custody Defendants]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Representation]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Order]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Supplement]
    Date Published:November 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:May 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:April 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:March 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:October 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Exparte]
    Date Published:October 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:October 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:October 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:September 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:March 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Reducing Sentence - USSC Amendment]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
    Date Published:February 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Hearing Held]
    Date Published:January 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
    Date Published:September 24, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.ilnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?142625
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =