U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Illinois

illinois Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Illinois
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 13-31965-lkg
  • Case Name: Jamar A Hemphill, Sr and Johnell L Hemphill
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Final Decree]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Chapter 13 Trustee Final Report and Account]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Discharging Chapter 13 Debtor]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Certificate of Service]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [CH 13 Trustee's Notice]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Notice of Motion]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [For Order of Discharge]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Update Other Deadlines]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1]
  • November 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Releasing Employer]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Report of Plan Completion]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Personal Financial Management Course]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Certificate of Service]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Disallowing Claim]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Certificate of Service]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Disallowing Claim]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Objection to Untimely Claim]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Objection to Untimely Claim]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Certificate of Service]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Retain Tax Refunds]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Response (NO OBJECTION)]
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Notice of Motion]
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Retain Tax Refunds]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Approving Amended Plan]
April, 2017
  • April 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Pay Wages]
  • April 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Memo Requesting Wage Order]
  • April 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Response (NO OBJECTION)]
  • April 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Amended Chapter 13 Plan after Act of 2005]
  • April 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • November 08, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Notice of Discrepancy]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
November, 2015
  • November 11, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Certificate of Service]
  • November 10, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Order]
  • November 06, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 26, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Hearing Scheduled]
  • October 23, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Objection to Ntc of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • October 21, 2015: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simon, Russell C [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.