open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois
    Case Number:1:19-cv-03272
    Party Name:Dobbey et al v. Baldwin et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Preliminary Injunction]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ilnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?364701
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =