open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois

ILLINOIS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois
    Case Number:1:19-cv-07404
    Party Name:Spencer et al v. Austin et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to File Instanter]
    Date Published:January 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [File Instanter]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ilnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?370544
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =