open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois

ILLINOIS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois
    Case Number:19-33975
    Party Name:Joi Yvette Ivey
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Request for Service of Notices (batch)]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
    Date Published:July 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Hearing Continued (Motion)]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:February 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [none]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Compensation WITH Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:December 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [4-Notice of Filing]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Schedules]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Amended Petition]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Certification About a Financial Management Course (Form 423)]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Employer to Pay the Trustee]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ilnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1503909
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =