open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois

ILLINOIS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois
    Case Number:19-34000
    Party Name:April R Dixon
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radtke, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radtke, Steven R [Request Discharge Order]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radtke, Steven R [Certification About a Financial Management Course (Form 423)]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radtke, Steven R [Reaffirmation Agreement Reviewed - No Further Action]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radtke, Steven R [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radtke, Steven R [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - no funds]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radtke, Steven R [Request for Service of Notices]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radtke, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radtke, Steven R [Request Chapter 7 341 Meeting of Creditors No Asset]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radtke, Steven R [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ilnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1503936
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =