open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of Illinois

ILLINOIS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:1:20-cv-01121
    Party Name:Rednour v. CRST Expedited, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion/Petition]
    Date Published:July 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:June 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:June 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Quash]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:May 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:May 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery Plan - Proposed/Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Scheduling Conference (Rule 16)]
    Date Published:April 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:April 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance of Attorney]
    Date Published:April 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Complaint]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ilcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?79562
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =