U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois

illinois Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00068
  • Case Name: Ely v. U.S. Bank, N.A. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 07, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • May 05, 2025: [Dismiss]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 17, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.